blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0682869 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0682869



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3623
06.12.2013 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
18.11.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 7
21.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.10.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 25
11.10.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.06.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.06.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 10
17.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
12.06.2013 Letter Boards of Appeal Appeal 1
07.06.2013 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
05.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.06.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.06.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.05.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.05.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.05.2013 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
16.05.2013 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
16.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.05.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.05.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.05.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 18
08.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.05.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
07.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.05.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
02.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.05.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.05.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.04.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.04.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.04.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.03.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.03.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
25.03.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
25.03.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
23.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.03.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.03.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.03.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.03.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
21.03.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
21.03.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 37
20.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.03.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.03.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 16
14.03.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.03.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
06.03.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.02.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.02.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
22.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.02.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 6
22.02.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 6
22.02.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 6
22.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.01.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.01.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.12.2012 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
14.12.2012 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
04.12.2012 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
04.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.11.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
15.11.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
14.11.2012 Refund of fees Appeal 1
08.11.2012 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
08.11.2012 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
07.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.11.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
07.11.2012 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 40
07.11.2012 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 40
22.10.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.10.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.09.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 1
21.09.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 1
06.07.2012 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
21.06.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.06.2012 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
15.06.2012 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
07.06.2012 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 2
22.05.2012 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
17.05.2012 Fax relating to review procedure Appeal 30
16.05.2012 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure Appeal 5
16.05.2012 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
07.05.2012 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 1
05.05.2012 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
30.04.2012 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 1
25.04.2012 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
20.04.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure Appeal 1
18.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
18.04.2012 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 1
16.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
12.04.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.04.2012 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
12.04.2012 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 1
05.04.2012 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 4
05.04.2012 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 1
05.04.2012 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 1
30.03.2012 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
30.03.2012 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
27.03.2012 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
26.03.2012 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 48
21.03.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 1
21.03.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 1
21.03.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 29
21.03.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 2
21.03.2012 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 15
22.02.2012 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure Appeal 2
16.02.2012 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
16.02.2012 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
16.02.2012 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
16.02.2012 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
20.12.2011 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
15.12.2011 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
15.12.2011 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
08.12.2011 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 17
07.12.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
06.12.2011 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 3
06.12.2011 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 3
06.12.2011 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 2
06.12.2011 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 12
06.12.2011 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 12
06.12.2011 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 2
06.12.2011 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
06.12.2011 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
05.12.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
03.11.2011 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
04.10.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
30.09.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
29.09.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.09.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 64
26.09.2011 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 64
30.06.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.06.2011 General enquiry Appeal 1
16.06.2011 General enquiry Appeal 1
14.02.2011 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 29
14.02.2011 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 29
04.02.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
04.02.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
03.02.2011 Authorisation of representative Appeal 2
03.02.2011 Authorisation of representative Appeal 2
03.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.02.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.02.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.02.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
03.02.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.02.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.02.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.02.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.02.2011 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
01.02.2011 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 5
01.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
01.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
01.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.02.2011 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 5
01.02.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.02.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
31.01.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.01.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
31.01.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
31.01.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
31.01.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
31.01.2011 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 4
28.01.2011 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
28.01.2011 Document concerning representation Appeal 3
28.01.2011 Document concerning representation Appeal 3
26.01.2011 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
25.01.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.01.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.01.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.01.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.01.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.01.2011 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
06.01.2011 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.12.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.12.2010 Claims Appeal 22
08.12.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
08.12.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.12.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.12.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.12.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 41
18.11.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.11.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
15.11.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
22.10.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
14.10.2010 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
13.10.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.10.2010 Request for change of representative Appeal 1
07.10.2010 Request for change of representative Appeal 1
06.10.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.10.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.10.2010 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
30.09.2010 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
28.09.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.09.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.09.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
15.09.2010 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.09.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.08.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 16
26.08.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 16
09.12.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.12.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.12.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
02.12.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
02.12.2009 Reply to appeal Appeal 14
30.11.2009 Reply to appeal Appeal 38
29.09.2009 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
29.09.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.09.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.09.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.06.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.05.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.05.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
19.05.2009 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.05.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.05.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.05.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
12.05.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
12.05.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
12.05.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.05.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
12.05.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 33
12.05.2009 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
12.05.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
07.05.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 126
16.03.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
27.02.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
27.02.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
25.02.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.02.2009 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
23.02.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
14.01.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.01.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
09.01.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.12.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
29.12.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
29.12.2008 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
29.12.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
29.12.2008 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.12.2008 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.12.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.12.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.12.2008 Means of redress Opposition 1
29.12.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
29.12.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
29.12.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
29.12.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.12.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.12.2008 Text intended for grant Opposition 23
06.11.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
20.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2008 Note on telephone consultation Opposition 1
13.10.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
13.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 153
13.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
13.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
13.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
10.10.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
09.10.2008 Claims Opposition 1
09.10.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2008 Claims Opposition 1
07.10.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2008 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.07.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.07.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
23.06.2008 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.06.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.03.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
26.02.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
26.02.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.02.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 109
05.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
15.05.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
19.03.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.03.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.03.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.11.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.11.2006 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.09.2006 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
19.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.09.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
19.09.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
19.09.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.09.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
19.09.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
19.09.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.09.2006 Notice of opposition Opposition 115
10.11.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
24.09.2005 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.09.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.09.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
03.06.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
03.06.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.06.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 46
18.11.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
28.10.2003 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 9
27.10.2003 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 9
21.03.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
21.03.2001 Description Search / examination 10
21.03.2001 Description Search / examination 5
21.03.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.01.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.01.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.09.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
15.09.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Claims Search / examination 9
18.01.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
18.01.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 32
18.01.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
18.01.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 18
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 34
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 36
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 44
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 22
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 118
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 28
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 68
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 28
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 34
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 274
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 36
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 20
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 30
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 20
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 22
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 72
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 56
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 48
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
18.01.2000 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 96
18.01.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
26.11.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.11.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.07.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
07.01.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
08.01.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 24
12.11.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.11.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.07.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
18.04.1996 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
06.09.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.09.1995 European search report Search / examination 4
06.09.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
06.09.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
08.05.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.05.1995 Claims Search / examination 5
08.05.1995 Description Search / examination 49
08.05.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.1995 Priority document Search / examination 47
08.05.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6