EP0682285 - Overhead projector support leg mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodriguez, Ernesto M. Jr., c/o M.M. and M. Co. 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Peterson, James E., c/o M.M. and M. Co. 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 95107120.8 | 11.05.1995 | [1995/46] | Priority number, date | US19940242175 | 13.05.1994 Original published format: US 242175 | [1995/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0682285 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0682285 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/132 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
G03B21/132 (EP,KR,US);
G03B21/145 (KR);
G03B21/30 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S353/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/46] | Title | German: | Standbeinmechanismus eines Overhead-Projektorrahmens | [1995/46] | English: | Overhead projector support leg mechanism | [1995/46] | French: | Mécanisme de pied d'appui d'un cadre de support d'un rétroprojecteur | [1995/46] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 14.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.07.2000 | [2004/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4969733 (JEWISON CHARLES B [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 33; figures 4-7 * [A] 2; | [A]US4968134 (SHIMIZU KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 7, line 3 - line 14; figures 1-11 * |