Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0683581

EP0683581 - Synchronisation method, synchronisation circuit, exchange end terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2007Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.07.2007  [2007/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/16]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2005/35]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1995/47]For all designated states
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft
Lorenzstrasse 10
D-70435 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bunse, Stephan
Rosmarinweg 95
D-70374 Stuttgart / DE
[1995/47]
Representative(s)Brose, Gerhard , et al
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/47]Brose, Gerhard , et al
Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29
D-70449 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date95107237.012.05.1995
[1995/47]
Priority number, dateDE1994441795421.05.1994         Original published format: DE 4417954
[1995/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0683581
Date:22.11.1995
Language:DE
[1995/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:H04L7/04, H04J3/06
[1995/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/47]
TitleGerman:Synchronisationsverfahren sowie Synchronisationseinrichtung, Endgerät und Vermittlungsstelle dafür[1995/47]
English:Synchronisation method, synchronisation circuit, exchange end terminal[1995/47]
French:Méthode de synchronisation, circuit de sychronisation, centrale et terminale[1995/47]
Examination procedure15.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/16]
21.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2007Fee for grant paid
24.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.05.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/27]
Appeal following examination24.08.2005Appeal received No.  T1395/05
24.08.2005Statement of grounds filed
Opposition(s)29.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36]
27.09.2006Deletion: No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
10.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
23.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
17.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
13.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
14.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200612   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2006
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2006/47]
Former [2006/33]NL28.09.2005
SE28.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
Former [2006/22]NL28.09.2005
SE28.12.2005
Former [2006/13]SE28.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1577331  (PLESSEY CO LTD) [A] 1,6,7,9 * page 1, line 43 - page 2, line 23 * * page 2, line 43 - page 3, line 12 * * page 3, line 40 - line 49 * * page 5, line 38 - line 40 * * page 5, line 59 - line 65 *;
 [A]EP0425470  (ALCATEL AUSTRIA AG [AT]) [A] 1,6,7,9 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 7 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 15 * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 4 * * column 7, line 28 - column 8, line 56 *;
 [A]EP0141194  (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,6,7,9 * page 1, line 3 - line 14 *;
 [A]  - KAMRAN KIASALEH ET AL, "TIME AND FREQUENCY TRANSFER BETWEEN MASTER AND SLAVE CLOCKS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (19901001), vol. 38, no. 10, pages 1900 - 1912, XP000176878 [A] 1,6,7,9 * page 1905, column 1, paragraph V *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.61463
by applicantWO9115907