Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0683581 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0683581



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 241
25.02.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.06.2007 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
29.05.2007 Closing of application Search / examination 2
29.05.2007 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
25.05.2007 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
15.05.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
01.03.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
02.02.2007 Document concerning representation Search / examination 4
25.01.2007 Request for change of name Search / examination 8
18.01.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
14.12.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.12.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
14.12.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
29.11.2006 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
29.11.2006 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 14
29.11.2006 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
05.10.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
26.09.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
23.08.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
02.08.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
23.01.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 8
13.01.2006 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
10.01.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.11.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
11.11.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
24.08.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 6
19.08.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.07.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.06.2005 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
29.06.2005 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
29.06.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
29.06.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
29.06.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
29.06.2005 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 1
14.04.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.04.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.04.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.04.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
10.03.2005 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
18.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
18.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
18.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
18.02.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
15.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
15.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
15.02.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
28.12.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.12.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.08.2004 Description Search / examination 1
06.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.05.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.05.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.09.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.09.1995 European search report Search / examination 2
12.05.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.05.1995 Claims Search / examination 4
12.05.1995 Description Search / examination 16
12.05.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.1995 Drawings Search / examination 3
12.05.1995 Priority document Search / examination 25
12.05.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7