Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0683376

EP0683376 - Airbreathing propulsion assisted gun-launched projectiles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rockwell International Corporation
2201 Seal Beach Boulevard
Seal Beach, California 90740-8250 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/47]For all designated states
ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
2201 Seal Beach Boulevard
Seal Beach, California 90740-8250 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Grantz, Arthur C.
2216 Nelson Ave., No. 5
Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US
02 / Bowcutt, Kevin G.
16 Fairside Drive
Irvine, California 92714 / US
03 / Cervisi, Richard T.
10 Shadwell
Irvine, California 92720 / US
 [2001/49]
Former [1995/47]01 / Grantz, Arthur C.
2216 Nelson Ave., No. 5
Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US
02 / Bowcutt, Kevin G.
16 Fairside Drive
Irvine, California 92714 / US
03 / Cervisi, Richart T.
10 Shadwell
Irvine, California 92720 / US
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [1995/47]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date95107567.017.05.1995
[1995/47]
Priority number, dateUS1994024513017.05.1994         Original published format: US 245130
[1995/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0683376
Date:22.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0683376
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:F42B15/00, F02K7/10
[1995/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/47]
TitleGerman:Rohrabgeschossene Flugkörper die mit Luftatmenden Triebwerken unterstützt sind[1995/47]
English:Airbreathing propulsion assisted gun-launched projectiles[1995/47]
French:Projectile tiré par canon assisté par propulseur aérobie[1995/47]
Examination procedure22.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/31]
17.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
27.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
23.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2002Fee for grant paid
18.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
03.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
04.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3974648  (KEPLER CHARLES EDWARD) [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * column W * [Y] 4,6;
 [Y]EP0417012  (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) [Y] 4,6 * column 2, line 31 - line 33; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0248340  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 10; figure 3 *;
 [AD]US4539911  (FLATAU ABRAHAM [US]) [AD] 1,4,6 * column 2, line 33 - line 46; figure - *;
 [A]US5058826  (COFFINBERRY GEORGE A [US]) [A] 1-10 * column A; figure - *
 [A]  WETTERSTAD, "Das Staustrahltriebwerk mit Überschallverbrennung", LUFTFAHRTTECHNIKRAUMFAHRTTECHNIK., DUSSELDORF DE, vol. 12, no. 12, pages 342 - 345, [A] 1-10
by applicantUS4291533
 US5067406
 US4539911
 US4428293