Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0689132

EP0689132 - Visualizing object-oriented software [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/52]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Laffra, Johannes Christiaan
319 Croton Dam Road
Ossining, New York 10562 / US
02 / Malhotra, Ashok
212 Hessian Hills Road
Croton-on-Hudson, New York 10520 / US
[1995/52]
Representative(s)Teufel, Fritz , et al
IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH
Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht
71137 Ehningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
70548 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1999/35]Rach, Werner, Dr. , et al
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
70548 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1995/52]Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
D-70548 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date95107866.623.05.1995
[1995/52]
Priority number, dateUS1994026466323.06.1994         Original published format: US 264663
[1995/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0689132
Date:27.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0689132
Date:11.12.1996
[1996/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0689132
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1996
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44, G06F11/32, G06F11/00
[1996/47]
Former International [1995/52]G06F9/44
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/52]
TitleGerman:Visualisierung von objektorientierter Software[1995/52]
English:Visualizing object-oriented software[1995/52]
French:Visualisation de logiciels orientés objet[1995/52]
Examination procedure24.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/25]
23.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2000Fee for grant paid
05.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR26.07.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2001/24]FR22.12.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0596591  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 50 *;
 [A]EP0261853  (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * column W *;
 [X]  W. DE PAUW ET AL, "Visualizing the Behaviour of Object-Oriented Systems", ACM SIGPLAN NOTICES, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199310), vol. 28, no. 10, pages 326 - 337, XP000411735 [X] 1-11 * page 328, column R, paragraph 5 - page 333, column R, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/167962.165919
 [A]  M. F. KLEYN ET AL, "GraphTrace - Understanding Object-Oriented Systems Using Concurrently Animated Views", OOPSLA '88 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (19880925), pages 191 - 205, XP000299828 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [A]  "Visual Debugger for C++ Object-Oriented Programs", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, ARMONK, NY, US, (199405), vol. 37, no. 5, pages 245 - 246, XP002013894 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [DA]  BROWN M H, "EXPLORING ALGORITHMS USING BALSA-II", COMPUTER, (198805), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 14 - 36, XP000052904 [DA] 1-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.56
 [DA]  STASKO J T, "TANGO: A FRAMEWORK AND SYSTEM FOR ALGORITHM ANIMATION", COMPUTER, (19900901), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 27 - 38, XP000159243 [DA] 1-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.58216