Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0685156

EP0685156 - Agent for preserving the freshness of plants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hagiwara, Yoshihide
4-14, Hiraisanso Takarazuka-shi
Hyogo-ken / JP
For all designated states
HIH . BIOCENTER INC.
4-14, Hiraisanso Takarazuka-shi
Hyogo-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/49]For all designated states
Hagiwara, Yoshihide
4-14, Hiraisanso
Takarazuka-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
For all designated states
HIH . BIOCENTER INC.
4-14, Hiraisanso
Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hagiwara, Hideaki
4-14, Hiraisanso
Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
02 / Suzuki, Toshiaki
79, Furusaka 3-chome, Hojo-cho
Kasai-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
[1995/49]
Representative(s)Kraus, Walter , et al
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/49]Kraus, Walter, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date95108163.729.05.1995
[1995/49]
Priority number, dateJP1994013785530.05.1994         Original published format: JP 13785594
[1995/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0685156
Date:06.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0685156
Date:07.02.1996
[1996/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0685156
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:A01N3/02, A01N43/16
[1995/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/49]
Extension statesLT01.06.1995
LV01.06.1995
SI01.06.1995
TitleGerman:Mittel zum Frischhalten von Pflanzen[1995/49]
English:Agent for preserving the freshness of plants[1995/49]
French:Agent pour maintenir la fraîcheur des plantes[1995/49]
Examination procedure16.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/37]
05.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1999Fee for grant paid
10.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
FR05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
IT05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
GB29.05.2000
IE29.05.2000
LU29.05.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
FR05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
GB29.05.2000
IE29.05.2000
LU29.05.2000
Former [2004/39]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
GB29.05.2000
IE29.05.2000
LU29.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2004/07]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
GB29.05.2000
IE29.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2003/45]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
GB29.05.2000
IE29.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2003/17]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
GB29.05.2000
IE29.05.2000
MC31.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2002/26]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
GB29.05.2000
IE29.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2002/23]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
SE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
GB29.05.2000
IE29.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2002/11]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
DE06.04.2000
GB29.05.2000
IE29.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2001/50]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
GB29.05.2000
IE29.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2001/17]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
GB29.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2001/09]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2001/08]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH10.04.2000
LI10.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[DXY]EP0471584  (HAGIWARA YOSHIHIDE [JP]) [DX] 1-5 * page 3, lines 5-36; example 12 * [Y] 6-11;
 [Y]DE3624035  (ORGANOGEN MEDIZINISCH MOLEKULA [DE]) [Y] 6-11 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 40 *;
 [Y]JPS5032974B  ;
 [Y]JPH0393701
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 75, no. 47, Database accession no. 75-77937W, & JPS5032974B B1 19751025 (JUJO PAPER MFG KK) [Y] 6-11 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 22, Database accession no. 91-159311, & JPH0393701 A 19910418 (SHINAGAWA NENRYO KK) [Y] 6-11 * abstract *
by applicantJPH0231541
 JPH03204802
 JPH05124901
 JPH05124902
 JPH05139901
 US5346890
 JPH0565480