blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0686667


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.08.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.10.2001 [2001/41]
08.09.2000 (Expected) grant published on  25.10.2000 [2000/43]
04.08.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.06.2000 Renewal fee
12.04.2000 Communication of intention to grant
12.04.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.12.1999 Communication of intention to grant
10.06.1999 Renewal fee
26.02.1999 Examination report or reply
15.12.1998 Examination report or reply
25.08.1998 Examination report or reply
16.06.1998 Renewal fee
08.05.1998 Examination report or reply
24.02.1998 Examination report or reply
17.10.1997 Examination report or reply
17.10.1997 First examination report
23.04.1997 Renewal fee
24.05.1996 Request for examination filed published on  10.07.1996 [1996/28]
27.10.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.12.1995 [1995/50]