blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0686667
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59508798D 30.11.2000D1
Priority number Date
DE4420307 10.06.1994
DE59508798 29.05.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH07331026Global Dossier 19.12.1995A
Priority number Date
DE4420307 10.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0686667Global Dossier 25.10.2000B1
EP0686667 13.12.1995A1
Priority number Date
DE4420307 10.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE4420307 14.12.1995A1
Priority number Date
DE4420307 10.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2152343T 01.02.2001T3
Priority number Date
DE4420307 10.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5599862 04.02.1997A
Priority number Date
DE4420307 10.06.1994