Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0686667

EP0686667 - Graft polymers with enhanced surface gloss [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2001
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.10.2001 [2001/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[2000/43]
Former [1995/50]For all designated states
BAYER AG
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Köhler, Burkhard, Dr.
Mündelheimer Str. 94
D-47829 Krefeld / DE
02 / Tischer, Werner
Am Norfbach 9
D-41542 Dormagen / DE
03 / Piejko, Karl-Erwin, Dr.
Unterscheiderweg 7a
D-51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[1995/50]
Application number, filing date95108169.429.05.1995
[1995/50]
Priority number, dateDE1994442030710.06.1994         Original published format: DE 4420307
[1995/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0686667
Date:13.12.1995
Language:DE
[1995/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0686667
Date:25.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:C08L55/02, C08L55/04, // (C08L55/02, 83:10),(C08L55/02, 83:12)
[1995/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/50]
TitleGerman:Pfropfpolymerisate mit verbessertem Oberflächenglanz[1995/50]
English:Graft polymers with enhanced surface gloss[1995/50]
French:Polymères greffés à brillance de surface améliorée[1995/50]
Examination procedure10.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/28]
21.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.04.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2000Fee for grant paid
27.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.07.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE3427208  (BYK CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2467867  (BORG WARNER [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *
ExaminationEP0326690