Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0695906

EP0695906 - Pipe sealing pillow with positioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Manfred Vetter GmbH & Comp.
Blatzheimer Strasse 10-12
53909 Zülpich / DE
[2000/06]
Former [1996/15]For all designated states
Manfred Vetter GmbH & Comp.
Blatzheimer Strasse 10-12
D-53905 Zülpich / DE
Former [1996/06]For all designated states
Manfred Vetter GmbH
Burg Langendorf
D-53909 Zülpich / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Vetter, Manfred
Burg Langendorf
D-53909 Zülpich / DE
[1996/06]
Representative(s)Bauer, Wulf
Patentanwälte
Bauer Vorberg Kayser
Partnerschaft mbB
Goltsteinstrasse 87
50968 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/06]Bauer, Wulf, Dr.
Bayenthalgürtel 15
D-50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE
Application number, filing date95108244.524.05.1995
[1996/06]
Priority number, dateDE19940012304U04.08.1994         Original published format: DE 9412304 U
[1996/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0695906
Date:07.02.1996
[1996/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0695906
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:F16L55/12, F16K7/10
[1996/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [1996/06]
TitleGerman:Rohrdichtkissen mit Positionseinrichtung[1996/06]
English:Pipe sealing pillow with positioning system[1996/06]
French:Coussin d'étanchéité pour tuyaux avec système de positionnement[1996/06]
Examination procedure02.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/16]
14.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.1999Fee for grant paid
24.04.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.08.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Request for further processing for:28.08.1999Request for further processing filed
28.08.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.09.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
AT24.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
[2003/08]
Former [2002/10]GB09.02.2000
AT24.05.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
Former [2002/02]GB09.02.2000
CH31.05.2000
LI31.05.2000
Former [2001/12]GB09.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]GB546633  (UNDERPRESSURE ENG CO LTD, et al) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]GB589771  (PASS & COMPANY LTD E, et al) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]GB172483  (OLIVER WILLIAM DOUGAN) [A] 1 * figure - *
by applicantUS4612961
 US3459230