EP0687955 - Device for extracting photosensitive photographic films from cassettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2000/09] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benker, Gerhard, Dipl.Ing. Ichoring 32 c D-82057 Icking / DE | [1995/51] | Application number, filing date | 95108409.4 | 01.06.1995 | [1995/51] | Priority number, date | DE19944420659 | 14.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4420659 | [1995/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687955 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687955 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03D13/00 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
G03D13/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/51] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Fördern lichtempfindlicher fotografischer Filme aus Patronen | [1995/51] | English: | Device for extracting photosensitive photographic films from cassettes | [1995/51] | French: | Dispositif pour extraire de cassettes des films photographiques photosensibles | [1999/27] |
Former [1995/51] | Dispositif pour extraire des cassettes des films photographiques photosensibles | Examination procedure | 15.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 10.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.09.2000
ADMISSIBLE Gretag Imaging Management AG Althardstrasse 70 8105 Regensdorf / CH Opponent's representative Muschke, Markus Artur Heinz Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.09.2000
ADMISSIBLE Gretag Imaging Management AG Althardstrasse 70 8105 Regensdorf / CH Opponent's representative Muschke, Markus, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Schwabe, Dr.Dr. Sandmair, Dr. Marx, Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | 11.01.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.04.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.04.2002 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 05.07.2002 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/17] | Appeal following opposition | 25.06.2002 | Appeal received No. T0696/02 | 23.08.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.11.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0242817 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,2 * figure 3A; claim 1 *; | [A]US5308005 (HUTTEMAN LYNDON R [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4126579 | DE4311483 | EP0242817 |