Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0688735 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0688735



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 182
24.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.07.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.07.1999 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 3
30.07.1999 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 3
16.07.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
09.07.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.07.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
01.07.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
01.07.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
10.06.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
25.01.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.10.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.07.1998 Claims Search / examination 1
21.07.1998 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.07.1998 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
10.07.1998 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
06.07.1998 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 4
22.06.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
01.04.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
17.02.1998 Claims Search / examination 1
17.02.1998 Description Search / examination 2
17.02.1998 Drawings Search / examination 3
17.02.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.02.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
25.11.1997 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
25.11.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
04.09.1997 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.10.1996 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
18.03.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.03.1996 European search report Search / examination 2
04.07.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
04.07.1995 Priority document Search / examination 29
13.06.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.06.1995 Claims Search / examination 2
13.06.1995 Description Search / examination 10
13.06.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.06.1995 Drawings Search / examination 6
13.06.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6