Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0688735 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP95109094 EP98119942



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0891939Global Dossier 20.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
EP95109094 13.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE29521931U 05.11.1998U1
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
EP95109094 13.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI0688735T 30.04.2000T1
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
EP95109094 13.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5899301 04.05.1999A
Priority number Date
US47631695 07.06.1995
US94429497 06.10.1997
US17813693 30.12.1993
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2777340BGlobal Dossier 16.07.1998B2
JPH0840676 13.02.1996A
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0688735Global Dossier 19.01.2000B1
EP0688735 08.05.1996A3
EP0688735 27.12.1995A2
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT188945T 15.02.2000T
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU693542B 02.07.1998B2
AU2173595 11.01.1996A
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR9502924 30.01.1996A
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2152292 31.08.2004C
CA2152292 24.12.1995A1
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1081162C 20.03.2002C
CN1117938 06.03.1996A
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE688735T 09.04.1998T1
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69514574D 24.02.2000D1
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69514574T 07.09.2000T2
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0688735T 19.06.2000T3
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2141865T 01.04.2000T3
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FI95689C 11.03.1996C
FI95689B 30.11.1995B
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GR3033252T 29.09.2000T3
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR960000750 25.01.1996A
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT688735E 31.05.2000E
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2139829 20.10.1999C1
RU95110779 20.05.1997A
Priority number Date
FI943043 23.06.1994
TypeType Divisional application
  Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 10.08.1998
 EP0891939