Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0688735

EP0688735 - Elevator machinery and its installation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kone Corporation
Munkkiniemen Puistotie 25
00330 Helsinki / FI
[1998/35]
Former [1995/52]For all designated states
KONE OY
Munkkiniemen Puistotie 25
SF-00330 Helsinki 33 / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Aulanko, Esko
Käenkatu 6 C 33
FI-04230 Kerava / FI
02 / Hakala, Harri
Päivälänkatu 15 A 2
FI-05830 Hyvinkää / FI
03 / Mustalahti, Jorma
Raivaajantie 13
FI-05620 Hyvinkää / FI
[1995/52]
Representative(s)Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger
Patentanwälte
Wotanstraße 64
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/52]Zipse + Habersack
Kemnatenstrasse 49
D-80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date95109094.313.06.1995
[1995/52]
Priority number, dateFI1994000304323.06.1994         Original published format: FI 943043
[1995/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0688735
Date:27.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0688735
Date:08.05.1996
[1996/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0688735
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:B66B11/04
[1995/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/52]
Extension statesLT29.06.1995
LV29.06.1995
SI29.06.1995
TitleGerman:Aufzugsantrieb und sein Einbau[1995/52]
English:Elevator machinery and its installation[1995/52]
French:Machinerie d'ascenseur et son montage[1995/52]
Examination procedure31.10.1996Examination requested  [1997/01]
25.11.1997Request for accelerated examination filed
05.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
17.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.1999Fee for grant paid
30.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98112566.9   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 10.08.1998
EP98119942.5  / EP0891939
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2088690  (CRISPEN CLARENCE C) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 42 - page 2, line 17; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US5018603  (ITO HIROYASU [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 40 - line 68; figures 4-7 *;
 [A]US4664230  (OLSEN LAWRENCE O [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 4 - line 19; figures 1-5 *
by applicantUS5018603