Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0687761

EP0687761 - Multiprogram washing machine with an electromechanical programmer and a digital microcontroller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2001
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merloni Elettrodomestici S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 47
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
[2000/44]
Former [1995/51]For all designated states
Merloni Elettrodomestici S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 47
I-60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Mariotti, Costantino
Via Ermanno Caserta 4
I-06028 Sigillo (PG) / IT
[1995/51]
Application number, filing date95109280.815.06.1995
[1995/51]
Priority number, dateIT1994TO0049716.06.1994         Original published format: IT TO940497
[1995/51]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0687761
Date:20.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0687761
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:D06F39/00
[1995/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GR [1995/51]
TitleGerman:Mehrprogramm-waschmaschine mit einem elektromechanischen Schaltwerk und einer digitalen Steuereinheit[1995/51]
English:Multiprogram washing machine with an electromechanical programmer and a digital microcontroller[1995/51]
French:Machine à laver à programmes multiples avec un programmateur électromécanique et un microcontrôleur digital[1995/51]
Examination procedure25.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/31]
28.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
07.04.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2000Fee for grant paid
23.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43]
Request for further processing for:17.06.1998Request for further processing filed
02.06.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.07.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR02.11.2000
[2004/07]
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5150489  (KAJI SHINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9 * column 5, line 27 - line 42 * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 8; figures 1,3 * [A] 6;
 [A]US5211037  (ADAMSKI JOSEPH R [US], et al) [A] 1,2,9 * column A; figure 2 *;
 [A]FR2598443  (CANDY ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [A] 1,2,4,9 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE3303992  (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,9 * figure .; claim - *;
 [A]EP0504052  (CIAPEM [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,9 * figure -; claim - *