Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0690327

EP0690327 - Wide angle, deep field, close focusing optical system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mantis Wildlife Films Pty. Limited
14 Taylors Road Dural
New South Wales 2158 / AU
[N/P]
Former [1996/01]For all designated states
Mantis Wildlife Films Pty. Limited
14 Taylors Road
Dural, New South Wales 2158 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Frazier, James A.
1/206 Pacific Highway
Lindfield 2067 / AU
[1996/01]
Representative(s)Gleiss, Alf-Olav
Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Leitzstraße 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Gleiss, Alf-Olav
Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2003/48]Gleiss, Alf-Olav
Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1996/35]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [1996/01]Patentanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
D-80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date95109659.321.06.1995
[1996/01]
Priority number, dateUS1994026842030.06.1994         Original published format: US 268420
[1996/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0690327
Date:03.01.1996
Language:EN
[1996/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0690327
Date:04.06.1997
[1997/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:G02B13/00, G02B15/02
[2004/19]
Former International [1997/23]G02B13/06, G02B13/00, G02B15/02
Former International [1996/01]G02B13/06
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1996/01]
TitleGerman:Optisches Weitwinkelsystem mit grosser Schärfentiefe und kurzen Brennweite[1996/01]
English:Wide angle, deep field, close focusing optical system[1996/01]
French:Système optique à grand angle, à grand profondeur de champ et à courte distance focale[1996/01]
Examination procedure03.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/05]
10.08.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
16.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
26.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
17.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2003Date of oral proceedings
10.07.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/49]
21.09.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/49]
Appeal following examination03.09.2003Appeal received No.  T1033/04
14.11.2003Statement of grounds filed
21.09.2006Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
21.09.2006Date of oral proceedings
28.09.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP03019840.2  / EP1382987
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
05.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
11.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
22.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200309   M06   Fee paid on   02.01.2004
30.06.200410   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2004
30.06.200511   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2005
30.06.200612   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPS5848011  (FUJI SHASHIN KOKI KK) [X] 1,19,28,36 * column W * [A] 2,14,18,21,30,34,37;
 [XA]US5237356  (OHTSUKA HIROYUKI) [X] 1,6,19,20,22,28,36 * column W * [A] 14,16,18,30,34,37;
 [A]JPS5968725  (CANON KK) [A] 1,3,4,6,14-16,18,19,22,28-30,36,37 * column W *;
 [A]US4449794  (YAMADA KENJI [JP]) [A] 1,14,18,19,30,36,37 * column W *;
 [A]US4984886  (YOSHIDA HAJIME) [A] 1,14,18,19,30,36,37 * column W *