Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0690327 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0690327



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 403
11.02.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
02.11.2006 Closing of application Search / examination 2
27.10.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 12
28.09.2006 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
27.09.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.09.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.08.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.08.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.08.2006 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
02.06.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.04.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 11
26.04.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
26.04.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.04.2006 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.04.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
22.02.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
06.12.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.09.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
31.08.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
13.08.2004 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
11.08.2004 Request for re-establishment of rights allowed Appeal 1
19.06.2004 Claims Appeal 1
19.06.2004 Claims Appeal 6
19.06.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
18.06.2004 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
22.04.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.04.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
08.04.2004 Annex Search / examination 4
08.04.2004 Annex Search / examination 1
08.04.2004 Non-scannable object Search / examination 2
08.04.2004 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
08.04.2004 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 20
07.04.2004 Request for re-establishment of rights Search / examination 29
09.03.2004 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.02.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.02.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.02.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
19.02.2004 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
19.02.2004 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
19.02.2004 Means of redress Search / examination 1
10.02.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
15.11.2003 Claims Search / examination 6
15.11.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
15.11.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Search / examination 4
14.11.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Search / examination 12
14.10.2003 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
14.10.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
01.10.2003 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
30.09.2003 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
18.09.2003 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
17.09.2003 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
10.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 8
10.09.2003 Notice of appeal Search / examination 2
03.09.2003 Notice of appeal Search / examination 3
03.09.2003 Notice of appeal Search / examination 1
01.09.2003 Notice of appeal Search / examination 1
04.08.2003 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
10.07.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.07.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
10.07.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
12.03.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.03.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.02.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
26.02.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.02.2003 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
17.12.2002 Claims Search / examination 6
17.12.2002 Claims Search / examination 6
17.12.2002 Description Search / examination 3
17.12.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.10.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.09.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.08.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.04.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.04.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.02.2002 Claims Search / examination 7
26.02.2002 Description Search / examination 8
26.02.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
26.02.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 28
25.02.2002 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
25.02.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.10.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
16.10.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.08.2001 Claims Search / examination 5
10.08.2001 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 4
18.04.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.04.1997 European search report Search / examination 2
29.11.1995 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.08.1995 Claims Search / examination 5
30.08.1995 Drawings Search / examination 6
30.08.1995 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 2
07.08.1995 Deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
14.07.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
14.07.1995 Priority document Search / examination 37
21.06.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.06.1995 Claims Search / examination 7
21.06.1995 Description Search / examination 16
21.06.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.06.1995 Drawings Search / examination 6
21.06.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6