Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0695778

EP0695778 - Thermoplastic oriented film containing hollow particles, method of manufacture and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2002  [2002/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
Professor-Staudinger-Strasse
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
Professor-Staudinger-strasse
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
An der B43
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
Former [1998/44]For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
An der B 43
65451 Kelsterbach / DE
Former [1998/16]For all designated states
Ticona GmbH
Gebäude K 801
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1996/06]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schreck, Michael
Rauenthaler Weg 32
D-60529 Frankfurt / DE
02 / Ahlers, Michael
Im Münchfeld 11
D-55122 Mainz / DE
03 / Osan, Frank
Hattersheimer Strasse 27-29
D-65779 Kelkheim / DE
[1996/06]
Application number, filing date95109715.322.06.1995
[1996/06]
Priority number, dateDE1994442737703.08.1994         Original published format: DE 4427377
[1996/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0695778
Date:07.02.1996
[1996/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0695778
Date:13.05.1998
[1998/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0695778
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:C08J5/18, B32B27/20, B32B27/32, B01J13/04, C08L23/12
[1996/06]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/06]
TitleGerman:Orientierte Folie aus thermoplastischem Polymer mit partikelförmigen Hohlkörpern, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung[1996/06]
English:Thermoplastic oriented film containing hollow particles, method of manufacture and its use[1996/06]
French:Feuille thermoplastique orienté contenant des particules creuses, procédé de fabrication et son utilisation[1996/06]
Examination procedure13.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/02]
25.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2001Fee for grant paid
18.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[PX]US5350733  (CAMPBELL BRUCE C [US], et al) [PX] 1-23 * abstract * * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 17 * * column 4, line 49 - line 61 * * column 5, line 32 - line 68 *;
 [DXY]EP0083495  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [DX] 22 * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 24; example 3; claim - * [Y] 1-21,23;
 [Y]US4496620  (PARK HEE C [US], et al) [Y] 1-21,23 * column 3, line 6 - line 30; claim - *;
 [A]US4701369  (DUNCAN GARY L [US]) [A] 1-23 * column 5, line 13 - line 19; claim - * * column 5, line 36 - line 38 *;
 [A]JPH04306647  ;
 [A]JPH01299832
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 50, Database accession no. 92-410606, & JPH04306647 A 19921029 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 03, Database accession no. 90-019528, & JPH01299832 A 19891204 (TEIJIN KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantEP0004633
 EP0083495
 EP0156464
 EP0286164
 EP0475893
 EP0503422
 US3330815
 EP0159464
 EP0078633
 EP0044515
 EP0180087
 EP0236945
 DE3801535
 US4622237
    - M. BORNSCHEIN ET AL., DIE PHARMAZIE, (1989), vol. 44, no. 9, page 585 FF.
    - Y. KAWASHIMA ET AL., J. PHARM. SCIENCES, (1992), vol. 81, no. 2, page 135 FF.
    - Ullmanns Encyklopaedie der techn. Chemie, vol. 12, pages 525 - 555
 DE19904036264