Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0691638

EP0691638 - Changed line detecting apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/02]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Aratani, Shuntaro, c/o Canon K.K.
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP
[1996/02]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/02]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date95110341.503.07.1995
[1996/02]
Priority number, dateJP1994015223704.07.1994         Original published format: JP 15223794
[1996/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0691638
Date:10.01.1996
Language:EN
[1996/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0691638
Date:15.01.1997
[1997/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0691638
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/36
[1996/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1996/02]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Erkennung von geänderten Zeilen[1996/02]
English:Changed line detecting apparatus and method[1996/02]
French:Méthode et dispositif de détection de lignes modifiées[1996/02]
Examination procedure02.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/31]
24.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2003Fee for grant paid
10.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR11.06.2003
IT11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
SE11.09.2003
DE12.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]FR11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
SE11.09.2003
DE12.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/23]NL11.06.2003
SE11.09.2003
DE12.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/10]NL11.06.2003
SE11.09.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/03]NL11.06.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/02]NL11.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0583102  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 7, line 34 - line 44 *;
 [A]EP0435701  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column 5, line 41 - column 7, line 56; figure 11 * * column 10, line 30 - column 11, line 14 *;
 [XP]EP0608053  (CANON KK [JP]) [XP] 1-5 * figures 42,47; claims 1-11,17 *