Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0696783

EP0696783 - Electronic article surveillance system having enhanced tag deactivation capacity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sensormatic Electronics Corporation
500 Northwest 12th Avenue
Deerfield Beach, Florida 33442-1795 / US
[1996/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Bergman, Adam S.
335 NE 28th Road
Boca Raton, Florida 33431 / US
02 / Drew, Douglas Allen
18344 181st Circle, S
Boca Raton, Florida 33431 / US
[1996/07]
Representative(s)Hafner, Dieter , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Dr. D. Hafner
Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/07]Hafner, Dieter, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Dr. Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Ostendstrasse 132
D-90482 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date95110401.704.07.1995
[1996/07]
Priority number, dateUS1994028808710.08.1994         Original published format: US 288087
[1996/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0696783
Date:14.02.1996
[1996/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0696783
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/24
[1996/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1996/07]
TitleGerman:Warenüberwachungssystem mit Etikettendeaktivierungskapazität[1996/07]
English:Electronic article surveillance system having enhanced tag deactivation capacity[1996/07]
French:Système électronique de surveillance d'articles avec capacité de déactivation d'étiquettes[1996/07]
Examination procedure27.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/17]
29.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.1999Fee for grant paid
02.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AD]US3938044  (LICHTBLAU GEORGE JAY) [AD] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0435538  (CHECKPOINT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 9, line 12 - line 28; figures 1,3 *
by applicantUS3938044
 US4881061