EP0696784 - Magnetomechanical article surveillance marker with a tunable resonant frequency [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 500 Northwest 12th Avenue Deerfield Beach, Florida 33442-1795 / US | [1996/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lian, Ming-Ren 14001 Spoonbill Lane Clearwater, Florida 34622 / US | [1996/07] | Representative(s) | Hafner, Dieter, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/07] | Hafner, Dieter, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Phys., et al Dr. Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Ostendstrasse 132 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110602.0 | 07.07.1995 | [1996/07] | Priority number, date | US19940288556 | 10.08.1994 Original published format: US 288556 | [1996/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0696784 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0696784 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/24 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
G08B13/2408 (EP,US);
G01R33/18 (EP,US);
G01V15/00 (EP,US);
G08B13/2434 (EP,US);
G08B13/2437 (EP,US);
G08B13/244 (EP,US);
G08B13/2442 (EP,US);
G08B13/2488 (EP,US);
H01F1/15316 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1996/07] | Title | German: | Magnetomechanisches Warenüberwachungsetikett mit abstimmbarer Resonanzfrequenz | [1996/07] | English: | Magnetomechanical article surveillance marker with a tunable resonant frequency | [1996/07] | French: | Etiquette magnétomécanique de surveillance d'objets avec fréquence de résonance accordable | [1996/07] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 06.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2268369 (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]) [X] 1,8,13,18,22,27,29,31,34,39 * page 3, line 6 - line 13 ** page 4, line 26 - line 33 * | by applicant | US4510489 | US19940269651 |