Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0681843 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0681843



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1118
20.05.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.05.2010 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.05.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
10.05.2010 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
10.05.2010 French translation of claims Opposition 1
10.05.2010 German translation of the claims Opposition 1
07.05.2010 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
07.05.2010 French translation of claims Opposition 1
07.05.2010 German translation of the claims Opposition 1
29.01.2010 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
29.01.2010 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
29.01.2010 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
22.01.2010 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
21.01.2010 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
14.10.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.10.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.10.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 22
10.07.2009 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 13
02.06.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 2
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 2
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Claims Appeal 2
27.05.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.05.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.05.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 27
06.05.2009 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
03.04.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.04.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.03.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 7
19.03.2009 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.03.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
25.06.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.06.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.06.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.03.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.03.2008 Claims Appeal 1
22.03.2008 Claims Appeal 1
22.03.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
20.03.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 6
04.01.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
11.12.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.12.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
05.12.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
18.10.2007 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
16.10.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.10.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.06.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.06.2007 Claims Appeal 1
11.06.2007 Claims Appeal 1
11.06.2007 Claims Appeal 3
11.06.2007 Claims Appeal 2
11.06.2007 Claims Appeal 1
11.06.2007 Claims Appeal 2
11.06.2007 Claims Appeal 2
11.06.2007 Claims Appeal 2
11.06.2007 Claims Appeal 1
11.06.2007 Claims Appeal 1
11.06.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
08.06.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 22
05.04.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
02.04.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.04.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
30.03.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.02.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.02.2007 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.02.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 12
02.02.2007 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.02.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.02.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 10
02.02.2007 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.02.2007 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.02.2007 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.12.2006 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
06.12.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.12.2006 Claims Opposition 1
06.12.2006 Description Opposition 2
06.12.2006 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
06.12.2006 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
21.11.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
21.11.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.11.2006 Claims Opposition 1
20.11.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.11.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 2
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 2
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 2
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
09.10.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
09.10.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.10.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
09.10.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
09.10.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
06.10.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
06.10.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.10.2006 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
06.10.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
05.10.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 2
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 2
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 2
05.10.2006 Claims Opposition 1
05.10.2006 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
17.07.2006 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
17.07.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.07.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.07.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.07.2006 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
06.07.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
06.07.2006 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 2
27.06.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2006 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.06.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.06.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.06.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.06.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.06.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.06.2006 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
08.06.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.06.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.06.2006 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
07.06.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.06.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.06.2006 Annex to the communication Opposition 8
02.06.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.12.2005 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
23.05.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.05.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
06.05.2005 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 1
06.05.2005 Request for change of name Opposition 2
04.05.2005 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 1
04.05.2005 Request for change of name Opposition 2
03.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.2005 Claims Opposition 1
25.02.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
23.02.2005 Claims Opposition 1
23.02.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
06.12.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
30.11.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.11.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.10.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.10.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.10.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.09.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2004 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
10.09.2004 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
07.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.07.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
29.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.06.2004 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
14.06.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.06.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.05.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.05.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
12.05.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.05.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 370
12.05.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
12.05.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
12.05.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
12.05.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
12.05.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
12.05.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
06.05.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.05.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
06.05.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
06.05.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
26.06.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.06.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.06.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.06.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
10.02.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.02.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
10.02.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
24.01.2003 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
16.12.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.11.2002 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
21.11.2002 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.10.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
27.09.2002 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 22
24.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
24.06.2002 Description Search / examination 2
24.06.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.05.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
16.05.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.10.2001 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
02.08.2001 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
23.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
23.07.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
23.07.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.05.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
06.10.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
19.06.2000 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.05.2000 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.03.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
04.03.1999 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 2
20.04.1996 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
23.01.1996 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
22.01.1996 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
22.01.1996 Claims Search / examination 1
22.01.1996 Description Search / examination 9
22.01.1996 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
18.01.1996 Claim deemed abandoned Search / examination 1
30.11.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.11.1995 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
27.09.1995 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 1
19.09.1995 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
13.09.1995 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 1
10.07.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.07.1995 Claims Search / examination 3
10.07.1995 Description Search / examination 37
10.07.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.07.1995 Drawings Search / examination 3
10.07.1995 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 5
10.07.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
13.06.1992 Priority document Search / examination 30