Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0707329

EP0707329 - Safety switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HANS BERNSTEIN SPEZIALFABRIK FÜR SCHALTKONTAKTE GmbH & CO.
Postfach 11 64, Untere Bult 2
32457 Porta Westfalica / DE
[2000/02]
Former [1996/16]For all designated states
HANS BERNSTEIN SPEZIALFABRIK FÜR SCHALTKONTAKTE GmbH & CO.
Postfach 11 64, Untere Bult 2
D-32457 Porta Westfalica / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wecke, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing.
Georgstr. 5a
D-31675 Bückeburg / DE
02 / Mönnings, Roland, Dipl.-Ing.
Ellerburger Str. 33
D-32457 Porta Westfalica / DE
03 / Hoppmann, Ralph
Tillystr. 5
D-32425 Minden / DE
[1996/16]
Representative(s)Stracke, Alexander , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
D-33613 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date95111312.519.07.1995
[1996/16]
Priority number, dateDE1994443657913.10.1994         Original published format: DE 4436579
[1996/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0707329
Date:17.04.1996
Language:DE
[1996/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0707329
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:H01H27/00, F16P3/08
[1996/16]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/16]
TitleGerman:Sicherheitsschalter[1996/16]
English:Safety switch[1996/16]
French:Interrupteur de sécurité[1996/16]
Examination procedure07.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/32]
18.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.1999Fee for grant paid
14.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[PX]DE4338910  (BERNSTEIN HANS SPEZIALFABRIK [DE]) [PX] 1-6,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0117396  (KRONENBERG GMBH H & J [DE]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 3; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4963706  (MOHTASHAM MEHDI [GB]) [A] 1,3 * column W *;
 [A]WO9110247  (KLOECKNER MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1;
 [A]EP0609672  (SCHMERSAL K A GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1
by applicantDE3100862
 DE3330109