Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0694632

EP0694632 - Electrolysis cell diaphragm reclamation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OxyTech Systems, Inc.
100 Seventh Avenue Chardon
Ohio 44024-1000 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/05]For all designated states
OxyTech Systems, Inc.
100 Seventh Avenue
Chardon, Ohio 44024-1000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Arnold, Mark L.
10545 East Washington
Chagrin Falls, Ohio 44023 / US
02 / Brannan, James R.
3728 Main Street
Perry, Ohio 44081 / US
03 / Kus, Richard A.
10020 Stone Hollow Road
Conrod, Ohio 44060 / US
04 / Romine, Richard L.
7351 Trotwood Drive
Concord, Ohio 44077 / US
[1996/05]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1996/05]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
D-81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date95111853.827.07.1995
[1996/05]
Priority number, dateUS1994028172328.07.1994         Original published format: US 281723
[1996/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0694632
Date:31.01.1996
[1996/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0694632
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.1995
ClassificationInternational:C25B11/00, C25B15/00
[1996/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1996/05]
TitleGerman:Regenerierung von Elektrolysezelle-Diaphragmen[1999/05]
English:Electrolysis cell diaphragm reclamation[1996/05]
French:Régénération d'un diaphragme de cellule d'électrolyse[1996/05]
Former [1996/05]Regenerierung von Elektrolysezelle-Diafragmas
Examination procedure25.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/38]
11.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.1999Fee for grant paid
15.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4174269  (CARLIN WILLIAM W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 54 *;
 [A]JPS6077985  ;
 [A]US4204921  (BRITTON WAYNE E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]SU1139771
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850829), vol. 009, no. 211, Database accession no. (C - 300), & JP60077985 A 19850502 (KAO SEKKEN KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 06, Database accession no. 86-040569, & SU1139771 A 19850215 (DRUZHININ) [A] * abstract *
ExaminationUS5133843
by applicantUS4853101
 US5205911
 US5133843
 US5246559
 US4410411
 US4606805
 US5183545
 US5188712
 US4252878