Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0696485

EP0696485 - Method for controlling double feeding of articles in mail distribution installations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/30]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [1996/07]For all designated states
Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH
Theodor-Stern-Kai 1
D-60596 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lohmann, Boris, Dr. Ing.
Höhrenbergstrasse 10
D-78476 Allensbach / DE
[1996/07]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1997/30]
Former [1996/07]Erbacher, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing.
Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern Kai 1
D-60596 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date95112506.109.08.1995
[1996/07]
Priority number, dateDE1994442844611.08.1994         Original published format: DE 4428446
[1996/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0696485
Date:14.02.1996
[1996/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0696485
Date:14.01.1998
[1998/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0696485
Date:26.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:B07C3/20, B07C1/02
[1998/02]
Former International [1996/07]B07C3/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/07]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung der Doppelstoffeingabe von Briefverteilanlagen[1996/07]
English:Method for controlling double feeding of articles in mail distribution installations[1996/07]
French:Procédé de commande d'une double alimentation en articles d'installations de distribution de courrier[1996/07]
Examination procedure20.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/17]
11.01.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2000Fee for grant paid
17.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES26.07.2000
GB26.07.2000
GR26.07.2000
IE26.07.2000
NL26.07.2000
AT09.08.2000
LU09.08.2000
BE31.08.2000
CH31.08.2000
LI31.08.2000
DK26.10.2000
PT26.10.2000
SE26.10.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]ES26.07.2000
GB26.07.2000
GR26.07.2000
IE26.07.2000
NL26.07.2000
AT09.08.2000
BE31.08.2000
CH31.08.2000
LI31.08.2000
DK26.10.2000
PT26.10.2000
SE26.10.2000
Former [2003/45]ES26.07.2000
GB26.07.2000
IE26.07.2000
NL26.07.2000
AT09.08.2000
BE31.08.2000
CH31.08.2000
LI31.08.2000
DK26.10.2000
PT26.10.2000
SE26.10.2000
Former [2003/08]ES26.07.2000
GB26.07.2000
IE26.07.2000
NL26.07.2000
AT09.08.2000
BE31.08.2000
CH31.08.2000
LI31.08.2000
PT26.10.2000
SE26.10.2000
Former [2002/26]ES26.07.2000
GB26.07.2000
IE26.07.2000
AT09.08.2000
BE31.08.2000
CH31.08.2000
LI31.08.2000
PT26.10.2000
SE26.10.2000
Former [2002/22]GB26.07.2000
IE26.07.2000
AT09.08.2000
BE31.08.2000
CH31.08.2000
LI31.08.2000
PT26.10.2000
SE26.10.2000
Former [2002/14]GB26.07.2000
AT09.08.2000
BE31.08.2000
CH31.08.2000
LI31.08.2000
PT26.10.2000
SE26.10.2000
IE09.03.2001
Former [2002/10]GB26.07.2000
BE31.08.2000
CH31.08.2000
LI31.08.2000
PT26.10.2000
SE26.10.2000
IE09.03.2001
Former [2002/02]GB26.07.2000
BE31.08.2000
PT26.10.2000
SE26.10.2000
Former [2001/50]GB26.07.2000
IE26.07.2000
PT26.10.2000
SE26.10.2000
Former [2001/28]GB26.07.2000
PT26.10.2000
SE26.10.2000
Former [2001/27]PT26.10.2000
SE26.10.2000
Former [2001/18]PT26.10.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2217080  (POST OFFICE [GB]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 12 - line 16; figures 3,5 *;
 [A]DE4000603  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0130810  (POST OFFICE [GB]);
 [A]US3837484  (RUCKEBIER W, et al);
 [A]EP0148783  (TOSHIBA KK [JP])