Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0683359

EP0683359 - Dried sludge melting furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.01.2000
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahicho Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/05]For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahicho
Ohta-ku Tokyo 144 / JP
Former [1995/47]For all designated states
EBARA-INFILCO CO., LTD.
6-27, Kohnan 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shiono, Shunichi
c/o Ebara-Infilco Co. Ltd., 6-27, Kohnan 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP
02 / Suzuki, Kazuyuki
c/o Ebara-Infilco Co. Ltd., 6-27, Kohnan 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP
[1995/47]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/47]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date95112604.419.05.1993
[1995/47]
Priority number, dateJP1992015278320.05.1992         Original published format: JP 15278392
JP1992015278620.05.1992         Original published format: JP 15278692
JP1992035568718.12.1992         Original published format: JP 35568792
[1995/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0683359
Date:22.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0683359
Date:01.05.1996
[1996/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0683359
Date:10.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:F23N1/02, F23N5/00, F23N5/18
[1995/47]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1995/47]
TitleGerman:Schmelzofen für getrockneten Schlamm[1995/47]
English:Dried sludge melting furnace[1995/47]
French:Four pour la fusion de la boue sèchée[1995/47]
Examination procedure30.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/52]
17.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.07.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.1998Fee for grant paid
27.10.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93108191.3  / EP0570949
Opposition(s)11.12.1999No opposition filed within time limit [2000/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH10.03.1999
FR10.03.1999
IT10.03.1999
LI10.03.1999
NL10.03.1999
GB10.06.1999
[2008/05]
Former [2004/35]CH10.03.1999
FR10.03.1999
LI10.03.1999
NL10.03.1999
GB10.06.1999
Former [2001/07]CH10.03.1999
LI10.03.1999
NL10.03.1999
GB10.06.1999
FR06.08.1999
Former [2000/52]CH10.03.1999
LI10.03.1999
NL10.03.1999
FR06.08.1999
Former [2000/50]NL10.03.1999
CH15.06.1999
LI15.06.1999
FR06.08.1999
Former [2000/24]NL10.03.1999
FR06.08.1999
Former [1999/36]NL10.03.1999
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0436759  (CHIBA CITY [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH03194314  ;
 [A]DE4129559  (NISSEI PLASTICS IND CO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH03160213
 [A]  - TOSHIO MIYAYAMA ET AL, "A COMBUSTION CONTROL SUPPORT EXPERT SYSTEM FOR A COAL-FIRED BOILER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS CONTROL AND INSTRUMENTATION (IECON), KOBE, OCT. 28 - NOV. 1, 1991, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19911028), vol. 2 OF 3, pages 1513 - 1516, XP000313484 [A] 1 * page 1513 - page 1516 *
 [A]  - WU ZHI-QIAO, "THE APPLICATION OF FUZZY CONTROL THEORY TO AN OIL-FUELED ANNEALING FURNACE", FUZZY SETS AND SYSTEMS, (19900530), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 145 - 156, XP000202703 [A] 1 * page 145 - page 156 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-0114(90)90088-N
 [A]  - KOFFMAN S J ET AL, "FUZZY LOGIC CONTROL OF A FLUIDIZED BED COMBUSTOR", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE, PITTSBURGH, JUNE 21 - 23, 1989, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19890621), vol. 3, pages 2756 - 2758, XP000088781 [A] 1 * page 2756 - page 2758 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911120), vol. 015, no. 457, Database accession no. (M - 1181), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911004), vol. 015, no. 393, Database accession no. (M - 1165), [A] 1 * abstract *