Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0704658

EP0704658 - Process for thermal treatment of waste material, especially refuse [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/14]Process for thermal treatment of waste material, especially refuse, and rotary drum furnace for carrying out the process
[2000/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Von Roll Umwelttechnik AG
Hardturmstrasse 131-135
8005 Zürich / CH
[2001/02]
Former [1997/47]For all designated states
Von Roll Umwelttechnik AG
Hardturmstrasse 131-135
8500 Zürich / CH
Former [1996/14]For all designated states
Von Roll Holding AG
Bahnhofstrasse
CH-4563 Gerlafingen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Rüegg, Hans
Bremgartnerstrasse 55A
CH-5610 Wohlen / CH
[1996/14]
Representative(s)Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1996/14]Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach
CH-8034 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date95112657.211.08.1995
[1996/14]
Priority number, dateCH1994000294629.09.1994         Original published format: CH 294694
[1996/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0704658
Date:03.04.1996
Language:DE
[1996/14]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP0704658
Date:24.07.1996
[1996/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0704658
Date:21.08.1996
[1996/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0704658
Date:10.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:F23G5/20, F23G5/027, C10B53/00, C10B1/10
[1996/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1996/14]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur thermischen Behandlung von Abfallmaterial, insbesondere Müll[2000/23]
English:Process for thermal treatment of waste material, especially refuse[2000/23]
French:Procédé de traîtement thermique des matières résiduaire, notamment des ordures[2000/23]
Former [1996/14]Verfahren zur thermischen Behandlung von Abfallmaterial, insbesondere Müll, und Drehrohrofen zur Durchführung des Verfahrens
Former [1996/14]Process for thermal treatment of waste material, especially refuse, and rotary drum furnace for carrying out the process
Former [1996/14]Procédé de traîtement thermique des matières résiduaires, notamment des ordures et four à tambour rotatif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé
Examination procedure05.09.1996Examination requested  [1996/45]
22.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.2000Fee for grant paid
14.10.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.10.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
24.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES10.01.2001
GB10.01.2001
DK10.04.2001
AT11.08.2001
LU11.08.2001
BE31.08.2001
[2004/39]
Former [2003/45]ES10.01.2001
GB10.01.2001
DK10.04.2001
AT11.08.2001
BE31.08.2001
Former [2003/10]ES10.01.2001
GB10.01.2001
AT11.08.2001
BE31.08.2001
Former [2003/06]ES10.01.2001
GB10.01.2001
BE31.08.2001
Former [2002/26]ES10.01.2001
GB10.01.2001
Former [2002/12]GB10.01.2001
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4734166  (ANGELO II JAMES F [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8 * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 21 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 16 * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 11-13,15,16;
 [Y]US4037543  (ANGELO JAMES F) [Y] 11-13,15,16 * column 2, line 43 - column 2, line 66 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 9 * * column 6, line 23 - column 6, line 55 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4976210  (DEWALD JACK J [US]) [A] 11-13,15 * column 4, line 46 - column 4, line 50; figures 3,3A *;
 [A]WO9107127  (AMERICAN COMBUSTION INC [US]) [A] 11,13,15,17 * page 16, line 30 - page 17, line 19; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]US4859177  (KREISBERG ALAN J [US], et al)
by applicant   MUELL UND ABFALL, (1978), no. 12,