Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0702489

EP0702489 - Control method for recording repetitively emitted broadcasts for a consumer electronics recording device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/12]Conrol method for recording repetitively emitted transmissions for a recording device of the entertainment electronics art
[1999/50]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2001
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For:AT  FR  GB  IT  NL 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
[2008/39]
Former [2000/02]For:FR  GB  IT  NL  AT 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH
Habsburgerallee 11
52064 Aachen / DE
Former [1997/05]For:FR  GB  IT  NL  AT 
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH
Röntgenstrasse 24
22335 Hamburg / DE
Former [1996/12]For:FR  GB  IT  NL  AT 
Grundig E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig GmbH & Co. KG
Kurgartenstrasse 37
D-90762 Fürth / DE
For:DE 
IR 3 Video International GmbH
Beuthener Strasse 57
D-90471 Nürnberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dötzer, Artur
IR 3 Video International GMBH, Beuthener Str. 57
D-90471 Nürnberg / DE
[1996/12]
Representative(s)van der Kruk, Willem Leonardus
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1997/05]van der Kruk, Willem Leonardus
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1996/12]Langer, Andreas
GRUNDIG E.M.V. Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz
D-90748 Fürth / DE
Application number, filing date95113011.118.08.1995
[1996/12]
Priority number, dateDE1994443303316.09.1994         Original published format: DE 4433033
[1996/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0702489
Date:20.03.1996
Language:DE
[1996/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0702489
Date:30.07.1997
[1997/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0702489
Date:02.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/782
[1996/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/12]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung der Aufzeichnung von wiederholt gesendeten Sendebeiträgen für ein Aufzeichnungsgerät der Unterhaltungselektronik[1996/12]
English:Control method for recording repetitively emitted broadcasts for a consumer electronics recording device[1999/50]
French:Procédé pour commander l'enregistrement d'émission répétées, pour un appareil d'enregistrement électronique grand public[1999/50]
Former [1996/12]Conrol method for recording repetitively emitted transmissions for a recording device of the entertainment electronics art
Former [1996/12]Procédé pour commander l'enregistrement d'émissions répétées, pour un appareil d'enregistrement d'électronique d'amusement
Examination procedure30.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/14]
26.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2000Fee for grant paid
19.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0604871  (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 28 *;
 [PA]EP0627857  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]) [PA] 1,2 * page 2, line 14 - line 43 *;
 [A]EP0571761  (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 15 *;
 [DA]  HANS ENGELKAMP, "Fernsehen - total digital", RF-MAGAZIN FÜR UNTERHALTUNGS- UND KOMMUNIKATIONSELEKTRONIK, (199405), pages 10 - 14, XP000672325 [DA] 1,2 * Seite 13, Absatz 'Near-Video-On-Demand...' *