Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0700807

EP0700807 - Motor space box for electric parts and their cable connection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2001
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.10.2001 [2001/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Automotive Systems Deutschland GmbH
Reinshagenstrasse 1
D-42369 Wuppertal / DE
[1996/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Hackel, Oliver, Dipl.-Ing.
Uellendahl 119
D-42109 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Schekalla, Peter
Engelshöhe 24
D-42329 Wuppertal / DE
03 / Koburg, Dirk, Dipl.-Ing.
Fontanestrasse 125
D-42897 Remscheid / DE
[1996/11]
Representative(s)Denton, Michael John
Delphi France SAS
Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2
22, avenue des Nations
CS 65059 Villepinte
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/13]Denton, Michael John
Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street
Luton Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB
Former [1996/11]Priebisch, Rüdiger
Delphi Automotive Systems Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Reinshagenstrasse 1
D-42369 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date95113066.519.08.1995
[1996/11]
Priority number, dateDE1994443185907.09.1994         Original published format: DE 4431859
[1996/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0700807
Date:13.03.1996
Language:DE
[1996/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0700807
Date:04.11.1998
[1998/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0700807
Date:08.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60R16/02
[1996/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/11]
TitleGerman:Motorraumdose zur Aufnahme elektrischer Bauteile und deren Leitungsanschlüsse[1996/11]
English:Motor space box for electric parts and their cable connection[1996/11]
French:Boîte pour espace moteur pour parties électriques et leurs bornes de connexion[1996/11]
Examination procedure04.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/26]
30.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.03.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
03.04.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2000Fee for grant paid
13.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/44]
Request for further processing for:17.03.2000Request for further processing filed
17.03.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.04.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4142525  (KABELWERKE REINSHAGEN) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0600272  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2254260  (CAVIS CAVETTI ISOLATI SPA [IT]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *