Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0711897

EP0711897 - Device for exerting resp. producing a pre-stress fixing or tightening force on, resp. at fitting elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEGENIA-FRANK KG
Eisenhüttenstrasse 22
57074 Siegen / DE
[2000/03]
Former [1996/20]For all designated states
SIEGENIA-FRANK KG
Eisenhüttenstrasse 22
D-57074 Siegen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Brück, Günter
Elsterweg 8
D-57555 Mudersbach / DE
02 / Graumann, Ingo
Grabenbäume 13
D-57250 Netphen / DE
03 / Schäfer, Karl
Bürgerstrasse 52
D-57234 Wilnsdorf / DE
[1996/20]
Application number, filing date95113357.825.08.1995
[1996/20]
Priority number, dateDE19940017867U08.11.1994         Original published format: DE 9417867 U
[1996/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0711897
Date:15.05.1996
Language:DE
[1996/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0711897
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:E05D5/06
[1996/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1996/20]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Ausüben bzw. Hervorbringen einer Befestigungsvorspannung oder Andrückkraft auf bzw. an Beschlagteile(n)[1996/20]
English:Device for exerting resp. producing a pre-stress fixing or tightening force on, resp. at fitting elements[1996/20]
French:Dispositif pour exercer resp. produire une fixation à pré-tension ou force de serrage sur, resp. à des éléments de ferrure[1996/20]
Examination procedure11.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/32]
18.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.1999Fee for grant paid
14.05.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
09.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
09.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4832388  (LOZANO) [A] 1 * column 4, line 39 - line 68; figures 3,4 *