Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0760374

EP0760374 - Unsymmetrically substituted metallocenes functionalized at only one cyclopentadiene moiety and their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2001 [2001/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Witco GmbH
Ernst-Schering-Strasse 14
59192 Bergkamen / DE
[1997/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Lisowsky, Richard, Dr.
Breslauer Strasse 9
D-59174 Kamen / DE
[1997/10]
Application number, filing date95113595.330.08.1995
[1997/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0760374
Date:05.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0760374
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:C07F17/00
[1997/10]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1997/10]
TitleGerman:Unsymmetrisch substituierte, an einem Cyclopentadienylring funktionalisierte Metallocene und deren Darstellung[1997/10]
English:Unsymmetrically substituted metallocenes functionalized at only one cyclopentadiene moiety and their preparation[1997/10]
French:Métallocènes substitués asymétriquement - seulement un groupement cyclopentadiènylique fonctionnalisé - et procédé de préparation[1997/10]
Examination procedure30.08.1995Examination requested  [1997/10]
13.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.1999Fee for grant paid
01.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[DX]  - CHURAKOV, A.V. ET AL., "SYNTHESIS OF SANDWICH AND HALF-SANDWICH COMPLEXSES OF Ti, Zr AND Hf CONTAINING .ETA.5-C5H4SIME2CL LIGAND. MOLECULAR STRUCTURE OF (TICL2(.MU.-OSIME2-.ETA.5-C5H4))2", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 489, pages C81 - C83, [DX] 4 * the whole document *
 [X]  - CHURAKOV, A.V., "SYNTHESIS OF CHLOROSILYLATED SANDWICH AND HALF-SANDWICH COMPLEXES OF EARLY TRANSITION METALS", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950410), vol. 122, no. 15, Database accession no. 187720n, [X] 4 * abstract *
    [] - VESTN. MOSK. UNIV., SER. 2: KHIM., vol. 35, no. 5, pages 483 - 484,