Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0703198 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0703198



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 431
05.12.2005 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
02.12.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 21
26.09.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
12.09.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.09.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.09.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.09.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.09.2005 Claims Appeal 2
08.09.2005 Claims Appeal 2
08.09.2005 Claims Appeal 2
08.09.2005 Claims Appeal 2
08.09.2005 Claims Appeal 2
08.09.2005 Claims Appeal 2
08.09.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.08.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
02.08.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.08.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
01.08.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.07.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.06.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.06.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.06.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.06.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
08.06.2005 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.06.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.05.2004 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 1
09.09.2003 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
05.09.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.08.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
25.04.2003 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.04.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
16.04.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
13.02.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
11.02.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.02.2003 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
27.01.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
18.12.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.12.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.12.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.12.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.12.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
06.12.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
06.12.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
06.12.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
06.12.2002 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 3
06.12.2002 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
06.12.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
06.12.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.10.2002 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
30.09.2002 Claims Opposition 1
30.09.2002 Claims Opposition 1
30.09.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
21.06.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.06.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
11.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.02.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.02.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.02.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.02.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.02.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
11.02.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.02.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
26.11.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.08.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.07.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
23.03.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
23.03.2001 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
28.02.2001 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.02.2001 Authorisation Opposition 1
16.02.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.02.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
16.02.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
16.02.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
16.02.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.02.2001 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
16.02.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.02.2001 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.02.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.02.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.02.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
06.04.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.02.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.02.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.02.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.12.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
24.11.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
18.08.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.08.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
10.08.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
23.11.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
23.11.1998 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
23.11.1998 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 15
23.11.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.07.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.12.1996 Written request for examination Search / examination 2
01.08.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.08.1996 European search report Search / examination 1
02.11.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
02.11.1995 Priority document Search / examination 19
02.11.1995 Translation of priority document Search / examination 28
11.09.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.09.1995 Claims Search / examination 3
11.09.1995 Description Search / examination 22
11.09.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7