blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0706782 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0706782



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 178
03.05.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.05.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.02.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.02.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
16.02.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
04.01.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
15.12.1998 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.11.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.11.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.11.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
13.10.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
17.08.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
17.08.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
17.08.1998 Description Search / examination 6
17.08.1998 Drawings Search / examination 1
17.08.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.04.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
06.03.1998 Claims Search / examination 6
06.03.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
06.03.1998 Description Search / examination 6
06.03.1998 Description Search / examination 8
06.03.1998 Drawings Search / examination 2
06.03.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.03.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.03.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.11.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
25.06.1996 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
14.05.1996 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
19.03.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.03.1996 European search report Search / examination 2
15.02.1996 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
29.01.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.01.1996 European search report Search / examination 3
22.09.1995 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.09.1995 Priority document Search / examination 31
11.09.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.09.1995 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
11.09.1995 Claims Search / examination 6
11.09.1995 Description Search / examination 16
11.09.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.1995 Drawings Search / examination 4
11.09.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6