blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0706782


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.04.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  14.06.2000 [2000/24]
13.05.1999 (Expected) grant published on  30.06.1999 [1999/26]
08.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.12.1998 Communication of intention to grant
28.12.1998 Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.11.1998 Communication of intention to grant
25.08.1998 Examination report or reply
14.08.1998 Renewal fee
24.04.1998 Examination report or reply
16.03.1998 Examination report or reply
31.10.1997 First examination report
30.10.1997 Examination report or reply
09.09.1997 Renewal fee
22.03.1996 Publication of search report published on  08.05.1996 [1996/19]
02.03.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.1996 [1996/16]
02.03.1996 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.1996 [1996/16]