Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0706782

EP0706782 - Osteosynthetic longitudinal alignment and/or fixation device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.04.2000
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.04.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.06.2000 [2000/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Synthes AG, Chur
Grabenstrasse 15
7002 Chur / CH
[1999/26]
Former [1996/16]For all designated states
Synthes AG, Chur
Grabenstrasse 15
CH-7002 Chur / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Filoso, Silvana
Obere Strasse 24
CH-7270 Davos-Platz / CH
02 / Frigg, Robert
Farbistrasse 10b
CH-7270 Davos-Platz / CH
[1996/16]
Representative(s)Lusuardi, Werther
Dr. Lusuardi AG
Kreuzbühlstrasse 8
8008 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]Lusuardi, Werther Giovanni, Dr.
Dr. Lusuardi AG, Kreuzbühlstrasse 8
CH-8008 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date95114202.511.09.1995
[1996/16]
Priority number, dateUS1994032302014.10.1994         Original published format: US 323020
[1996/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0706782
Date:17.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0706782
Date:08.05.1996
[1996/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0706782
Date:30.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/72
[1996/16]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1996/16]
TitleGerman:Osteosynthetisches Gerät zur Befestigung und/oder longitudinalen Ausrichtung[1996/16]
English:Osteosynthetic longitudinal alignment and/or fixation device[1996/16]
French:Appareil de fixation et/ou d'alignement longitudinal pour l'ostéosynthèse[1996/16]
Examination procedure11.09.1995Examination requested  [1996/16]
05.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.01.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.1999Fee for grant paid
17.02.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
04.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE2657303  (HAEMMERLE HELMUT) [X] 1-11,13-15,18-22,24-27,29,30 * page 14, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph 1; figures 1,4 * [Y] 31,32;
 [Y]WO9313713  (MCMAHON MICHAEL JOHN [GB], et al) [Y] 31,32 * page 16, line 4 - page 17, line 18 * * page 26, line 25 - page 27, line 2 *
 [A]  Synthes booklet entitled Universal Tibial and Femoral Nail System, JANUARY 1988, SWITZERLAND, INSTITUT STRAUMANN AG, [A] 26,27 * pages 5 and 6, illustration of tibia and femur nails *
by applicantSU1111748
 US5034012