Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0711937

EP0711937 - Metallic cylinder head gasket [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/20]Metallic gasket
[1999/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Sealing Systems GmbH
Hermann-Goetze-Strasse 8
57562 Herdorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/04]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Sealing Systems GmbH
Hermann-Goetze-Strasse
57562 Herdorf / DE
Former [1996/20]For all designated states
GOETZE Payen GmbH
Hermann-Goetze-Strasse
D-57562 Herdorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Papendorf, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing.
Am Hagen 7
D-51519 Odenthal-Glöbusch / DE
02 / Krauland, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing.
Seelsheide 10
D-51467 Bergisch-Gladbach / DE
03 / Heike, Matthias, Dipl.-Ing.
Südstr. 13
D-38159 Vechelde / DE
[1996/20]
Application number, filing date95114279.312.09.1995
[1996/20]
Priority number, dateDE1994444050312.11.1994         Original published format: DE 4440503
[1996/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0711937
Date:15.05.1996
Language:DE
[1996/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0711937
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/08
[1996/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/20]
TitleGerman:Metallische Zykinderkopfdichtung[1999/35]
English:Metallic cylinder head gasket[1999/35]
French:Joint de culasse métallique[1999/35]
Former [1996/20]Metallische Flachdichtung
Former [1996/20]Metallic gasket
Former [1996/20]Joint plat métallique
Examination procedure03.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/31]
26.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2000Fee for grant paid
03.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
17.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0465268  (NIHON METAL GASKET [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 3; figure - *;
 [A]EP0468526  (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 3; figure - *
by applicantEP0230804