Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0703017 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0703017



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 92
20.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
18.11.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.09.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
22.09.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.05.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
26.05.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
09.05.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
19.02.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
19.02.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.11.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.02.1997 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
25.09.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.09.1996 European search report Search / examination 3
18.07.1996 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
15.04.1996 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of designation fee) Search / examination 1
07.12.1995 Invitation to pay filing fee/search fee with additional fee Search / examination 1
12.09.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.09.1995 Claims Search / examination 4
12.09.1995 Description Search / examination 10
12.09.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.1995 Drawings Search / examination 2
12.09.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
12.09.1995 Priority document Search / examination 17
12.09.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6