blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0703017


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  04.04.2001 [2001/14]
03.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
29.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant
27.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.08.1999 Renewal fee
20.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
24.02.1999 Examination report or reply
06.11.1998 First examination report
30.10.1998 Examination report or reply
27.08.1998 Renewal fee
02.09.1997 Renewal fee
07.03.1997 Change - representative published on  23.04.1997 [1997/17]
27.09.1996 Publication of search report published on  13.11.1996 [1996/46]
27.09.1996 Change - classification published on  13.11.1996 [1996/46]
09.08.1996 Change - designated states published on  25.09.1996 [1996/39]
08.08.1996 Loss of particular rights
26.04.1996 Request for examination filed published on  12.06.1996 [1996/24]
10.04.1996 Loss of particular rights
09.02.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.03.1996 [1996/13]