Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0703017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59508191D 25.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
DE59508191 12.09.1995
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3828599BGlobal Dossier 04.10.2006B2
JPH08192222 30.07.1996A
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0703017Global Dossier 19.04.2000B1
EP0703017 13.11.1996A3
EP0703017 27.03.1996A2
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT191868T 15.05.2000T
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU686443B 05.02.1998B2
AU3281995 04.04.1996A
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2158911 25.03.1996A1
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1068533C 18.07.2001C
CN1128685 14.08.1996A
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE4434134 28.03.1996A1
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0703017T 10.07.2000T3
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2145192T 01.07.2000T3
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FI110997B 15.05.2003B
FI954503 25.03.1996A
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GR3033892T 30.11.2000T3
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR960010109 20.04.1996A
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NO953752L 25.03.1996L
NO953752D 22.09.1995D0
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2139159 10.10.1999C1
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5613631 25.03.1997A
Priority number Date
DE4434134 24.09.1994