Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0703017

EP0703017 - Method for the production of longitudinally seam welded metal tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Kabel AG & Co.
Kabelkamp 20
30179 Hannover / DE
[2000/16]
Former [1996/13]For all designated states
Alcatel Kabel AG & Co.
Kabelkamp 20
D-30179 Hannover / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ziemek, Gerhard, Dr.-Ing.
Bunzlauer Strasse 6
D-30853 Langenhagen / DE
02 / Staschewski, Harry
Werlhofstrasse 23
D-30853 Langenhagen / DE
03 / Porcher, Klaus
Burgdorfer Strasse 9
D-31275 Lehrte / DE
[1996/13]
Representative(s)Mende, Eberhard , et al
c/o Alcatel Kabel Beteiligungs-AG
Kabelkamp 20
30179 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/17]Mende, Eberhard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
c/o Alcatel Kabel Beteiligungs-AG Kabelkamp 20
30179 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date95114295.912.09.1995
[1996/13]
Priority number, dateDE1994443413424.09.1994         Original published format: DE 4434134
[1996/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0703017
Date:27.03.1996
Language:DE
[1996/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0703017
Date:13.11.1996
[1996/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0703017
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:B21C37/08, B21C37/083
[1996/46]
Former International [1996/13]B21C37/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/39]
Former [1996/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines längsnahtgeschweissten Metallrohres[1996/13]
English:Method for the production of longitudinally seam welded metal tubes[1996/13]
French:Procédé de fabrication de tuyaux métalliques soudés longitudinalement[1996/13]
Examination procedure13.10.1995Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/24]
15.04.1996Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, IE, LU, MC, PT
04.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.1999Fee for grant paid
18.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.12.1995BE   M01   Not yet paid
07.12.1995IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.12.1995LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.12.1995MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.12.1995PT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPS6044126  ;
 [PA]JPH06280070  ;
 [A]JPS58192627  ;
 [A]DE4118004  (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6-8 * column 3, line 44 - line 62; figure - *;
 [A]EP0115441  (OLIN CORP [US]) [A] 1,7-15 * page 19, line 26 - page 22, line 14 * * page 29, line 1 - line 11; figure -; claim 1 *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850717), vol. 009, no. 172, Database accession no. (M - 397), [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 5
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 94, no. 010, [PA] 1,3,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840215), vol. 008, no. 035, Database accession no. (M - 276), [A] 3 * abstract *
by applicantEP0299123