Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0702494

EP0702494 - Three-dimensional image display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP
Former [1996/12]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Uomori, Kenya
1-3-18, Koda
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP
02 / Morimura, Atsushi
No. 309 Ekuseruhaitsu-Dainigakuenmae, 540-10
Gakuen Naka 4-chome, Nara-shi, Nara 631 / JP
[1996/12]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/12]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date95114487.214.09.1995
[1996/12]
Priority number, dateJP1994022336019.09.1994         Original published format: JP 22336094
JP1994022336119.09.1994         Original published format: JP 22336194
[1996/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0702494
Date:20.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0702494
Date:05.06.1996
[1996/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0702494
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.1996
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/04, H04N13/00
[1996/23]
Former International [1996/12]H04N13/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/12]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur dreidimensionalen Bildwiedergabe[2001/49]
English:Three-dimensional image display apparatus[1996/12]
French:Appareil d'affichage d'images tridimensionnelles[1996/12]
Former [1996/12]Vorrichtung zur dreidimensionale Bildwiedergabe
Examination procedure20.09.1996Examination requested  [1996/47]
04.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.02.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2001Fee for grant paid
31.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0607000  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC) [X] 7,13,14 * page 6, line 27 - line 29; claim 1 * [A] 1,5;
 [A]US5250888  (YU HANG DU)