Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0750141

EP0750141 - Packing of a stuffing box with trapezoidal cross-section [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/52]Shaft packing with trapezoidal cross-section for a better pressure transfer
[1999/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Starnberger Werk für Beschichtungen und Dichtungen GmbH
Schiffbauerweg 5
82319 Starnberg / DE
[2000/04]
Former [1996/52]For all designated states
STARNBERGER Werk für Beschichtungen und Dichtungen GmbH
Schiffbauerweg 5
D-82319 Starnberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ekman, Hans
Kühtal 17
D-82319 Starnberg / DE
[1996/52]
Application number, filing date95114528.315.09.1995
[1996/52]
Priority number, dateDE1994443331819.09.1994         Original published format: DE 4433318
[1996/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0750141
Date:27.12.1996
Language:DE
[1996/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0750141
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/00, F16J15/22
[1996/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1996/52]
TitleGerman:Stopfbuchspackung mit trapezoidem Grundquerschnitt[1999/12]
English:Packing of a stuffing box with trapezoidal cross-section[2000/03]
French:Bourrage d'étanchéité pour arbre tournant ayant une section trapézoidale[1999/12]
Former [1996/52]Wellenpackung mit trapezoidem Querschnitt für verbesserte Druckübertragung
Former [1996/52]Shaft packing with trapezoidal cross-section for a better pressure transfer
Former [1996/52]Bourrage d'étanchéité pour arbre tournant ayant une section trapézoidale pour une meilleure répartition de la pression
Examination procedure04.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/14]
21.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.1999Fee for grant paid
01.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
16.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.10.1996AT   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1996
11.10.1996BE   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1996
11.10.1996DK   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1996
11.10.1996ES   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1996
11.10.1996FR   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1996
11.10.1996IT   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1996
11.10.1996LU   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1996
11.10.1996NL   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1996
11.10.1996SE   M01   Fee paid on   21.10.1996
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199703   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.1997
30.09.199804   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.1998
30.09.199905   M06   Fee paid on   16.11.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES26.01.2000
FR26.01.2000
IT26.01.2000
NL26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
DK26.04.2000
AT15.09.2000
LU15.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2007/29]ES26.01.2000
FR26.01.2000
NL26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
DK26.04.2000
AT15.09.2000
LU15.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2006/14]ES26.01.2000
FR26.01.2000
NL26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
DK26.04.2000
AT15.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2003/45]ES26.01.2000
NL26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
DK26.04.2000
FR23.06.2000
AT15.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2003/08]ES26.01.2000
NL26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
FR23.06.2000
AT15.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2002/26]ES26.01.2000
SE26.01.2000
FR23.06.2000
AT15.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2002/23]SE26.01.2000
FR23.06.2000
AT15.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2002/15]FR23.06.2000
AT15.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2002/02]FR23.06.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2001/09]FR23.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO9411555  (SEAL CO NEW ENGLAND INC [US], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0339232  (GARLOCK INC [US]) [A] 2 * column A; claims 1,9 *;
 [A]US4802398  (CHAMPLIN GEORGE B [US], et al) [A] 3 * column A *;
 [A]GB826214  (WALKER & CO JAMES) [A] 1 * page 1, line 68 - page 2, line 3; figure - *