EP0707187 - Installation for the thermic treatment of pulverized products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 51149 Köln / DE | [1997/19] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Claus Am Börschsgarten 18 D-51147 Köln / DE | [1996/16] | Application number, filing date | 95114604.2 | 16.09.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | DE19944436939 | 15.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4436939 | [1996/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0707187 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0707187 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | [1996/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707187 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F27B7/20, F27D17/00, C04B7/60 | [1996/44] | CPC: |
F27B7/2025 (EP,US);
C04B7/47 (EP,US);
F27B17/0016 (EP,US);
Y02P40/121 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B7/47, C04B7/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/16] | F27B7/20, F27D17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, FR [1996/16] | Title | German: | Anlage zur thermischen Behandlung von mehlförmigen Rohmaterialien | [1996/16] | English: | Installation for the thermic treatment of pulverized products | [1996/16] | French: | Installation pour le traitement thermique de produits en poudre | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 09.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4201546 (HERCHENBACH HORST [DE], et al); | [A]DE3215793 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]); | [A]EP0143395 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP0534225 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) |