Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0721975

EP0721975 - Adhesive resin composition and laminate thereof and production process of laminate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2001 [2001/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHOWA DENKO K.K.
13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/29]For all designated states
SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Koichi, c/o Showa Denko K.K.
Shiojiri Research Lab., 1, Oaza Soga
Shiojiri-shi, Nagano / JP
02 / Kasahara, Hiroshi, c/o Showa Denko K.K.
Kawasaki Plastics Lab., 3-2, Chidori-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Maruyama, Satoshi, c/o Showa Denko K.K.
Kawasaki Plastics Lab., 3-2, Chidori-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Ueno, Masahiro, c/o Showa Denko K.K.
Kawasaki Plastics Lab., 3-2, Chidori-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
05 / Minorikawa, Naoki, c/o Showa Denko K.K.
Kawasaki Plastics Lab., 3-2, Chidori-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1996/29]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/29]Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date95115169.526.09.1995
[1996/29]
Priority number, dateJP1995000352312.01.1995         Original published format: JP 352395
JP1995000658919.01.1995         Original published format: JP 658995
[1996/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0721975
Date:17.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0721975
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:C09J123/08
[1996/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/29]
TitleGerman:Klebstoffzusammensetzung und darauf basierendes Laminat und Herstellungsverfahren des Laminates[1996/29]
English:Adhesive resin composition and laminate thereof and production process of laminate[1996/29]
French:Composition de résine adhésive, laminés utilisant cette composition et son procédé de fabrication[1996/29]
Examination procedure20.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/09]
15.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.1999Fee for grant paid
03.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US4548985  (YAZAKI JINICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 2, line 23 - line 44 * * column 3, line 40 - line 57 * * column 4, line 1 - line 3 *;
 [X]EP0144808  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 16 * * page 6, line 11 - line 19 *;
 [X]FR2237944  (ICI LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,6 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 39 *;
 [X]US5095046  (TSE MUN F [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * column 8, line 57 - line 63 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 42 *
by applicantJPS57157724
 JPS57133055
 JPS5975915
 JPS60112815