Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0765604

EP0765604 - Process and apparatus for flavouring tea and similar products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.10.2001 [2001/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEEPACK SPEZIALMASCHINEN GMBH & CO. KG
Düsseldorfer Strasse 73
D-40667 Meerbusch / DE
[1997/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Nippes, Helmut
Eifelstr. 122
D-42699 Solingen-Merscheid / DE
02 / Klein, Michael
Brombeerweg 25
D-47877 Willich / DE
[1997/14]
Representative(s)Rausch Wanischeck-Bergmann Brinkmann
Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/14]Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date95115219.827.09.1995
[1997/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0765604
Date:02.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0765604
Date:08.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:A23F3/40, B65B29/02, B65B1/36
[1997/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/14]
Extension statesLTNot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aromatisieren von Tee und teeähnlichen Erzeugnissen[1999/28]
English:Process and apparatus for flavouring tea and similar products[1997/14]
French:Procédé et installation pour aromatiser du thé et des produits analogues au thé[1997/14]
Former [1997/14]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aromatisieren von Tee und theeähnlichen Erzeugnissen
Examination procedure15.03.1996Examination requested  [1997/14]
01.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.1999Fee for grant paid
08.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
17.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.11.1996AT   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.1996
19.11.1996ES   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.1996
19.11.1996NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.1996
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE3701230  (SEELIG & HILLE R [DE]) [AD] 1,7 * column 2, line 33 - line 52; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3115589  (IMA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,7,9,12 * figure 1; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3108178  (BAKER PERKINS HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,7,9 * figures 1-5; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3720362  (TEEPACK SPEZIALMASCHINEN) [A] 1,7,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1566248  (TECHNIPAC LTD) [A] 1,7,9 * figures 1-3; claims 1-14 *
by applicantDE3701230
 DE3211696