Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0707074

EP0707074 - Method for determination of urea nitrogen [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KYOWA MEDEX CO., LTD.
1-1 Irifune 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]For all designated states
KYOWA MEDEX CO., LTD.
1-1 Irifune 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Unno, Tomoko
108-1, Nakayama
Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412 / JP
02 / Aoyama, Norihito
410-1, Nameri, Nagazumi-cho
Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411 / JP
[1996/16]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]Casalonga, Axel , et al
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8
D-80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date95115860.909.10.1995
[1996/16]
Priority number, dateJP1994024805313.10.1994         Original published format: JP 24805394
[1996/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0707074
Date:17.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0707074
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/58
[1996/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bestimmung von Harnstoff Stickstoff[1999/08]
English:Method for determination of urea nitrogen[1996/16]
French:Méthode de dosage de l'azote uréique[1999/36]
Former [1996/16]Verfahren zur Bestimmung von Harnstickstoff
Former [1996/16]Méthode pour la détermination de l'azote de l'urée
Examination procedure19.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/42]
04.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
23.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.1999Fee for grant paid
19.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
04.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
PT19.04.2000
IE09.10.2000
LU09.10.2000
[2007/29]
Former [2004/07]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
PT19.04.2000
IE09.10.2000
Former [2003/45]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
PT19.04.2000
IE09.10.2000
Former [2003/08]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
IE09.10.2000
Former [2002/23]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
IE09.10.2000
Former [2002/17]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
IE09.10.2000
Former [2001/09]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH25.04.2000
LI25.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS59151900  ;
 JPS51128485  [ ] (TANABE SEIYAKU CO);
 [A]US4462819  (VAN DER PUY MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [A]US4378430  (MODROVICH IVAN E [US]);
 [A]CH648060  (MODROVICH IVAN ENDRE);
 [A]EP0054096  (MODROVICH IVAN ENDRE)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841225), vol. 008, no. 283, Database accession no. (C - 258), & JP59151900 A 19840830 (DAIICHI KAGAKU YAKUHIN KK) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - ICHIRO CH. ET AL, "Stable water insoluble urease preparation.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19770516), vol. 86, no. 20, Database accession no. 145933S [A] * abstract *