EP0707121 - Panels for the manufacture of circular above-ground tanks, mould, and associated manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parenti, Giuseppe Via Nova 40 29100 Piacenza / IT | For all designated states Parenti, Cesarino Loc. Borghetto 81 I-29100 Piacenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states Parenti, Giuseppe Via Nova 40 I-29100 Piacenza / IT | ||
For all designated states Parenti, Cesarino Loc. Borghetto 81 I-29100 Piacenza / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | La Ciura, Salvatore Via Francesco Sforza 3 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | La Ciura, Salvatore Via Francesco Sforza 3 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95115934.2 | 10.10.1995 | [1996/16] | Priority number, date | IT1994PC00020 | 14.10.1994 Original published format: IT PC940020 | IT1995PC00019 | 15.09.1995 Original published format: IT PC950019 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707121 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707121 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E04H7/20, B28B7/28, B28B23/04 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
E04H7/20 (EP);
B28B23/046 (EP);
B28B7/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1996/16] | Extension states | SI | 10.10.1995 | Title | German: | Panelen für die Herstellung oberirdischer Rundbehälter, Giessform und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1996/16] | English: | Panels for the manufacture of circular above-ground tanks, mould, and associated manufacturing method | [1996/16] | French: | Panneaux pour la construction de réservoirs circulaires au-dessus du sol, moule et procédé de construction | [1996/16] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 18.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2000 | CH | 22.03.2000 | LI | 22.03.2000 | LU | 10.10.2000 | [2007/29] |
Former [2001/08] | AT | 22.03.2000 | |
CH | 22.03.2000 | ||
LI | 22.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 22.03.2000 | |
LI | 22.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1010934 (A. BLATON) [A] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]GB682320 (ARMAND BLATON, et al) [A] 6,7* page 2, line 64 - page 3, line 39; figure - *; | [YA]DE1684708 (WILHELM HORNBACH FA) [Y] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * page 5, line 10 - line 16 * * page 6; figures 2,4,6,7 * [A] 3; | [A]AT302921B (FRIEDRICH OESTREICHER ING) [A] 1,2,4 * page 2, line 9 - line 17 * * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 4; figure - *; | [A]FR2502221 (AUXILIAIRE ENTREPRISES SOC [FR]) [A] 1,2,4 * page 5, line 3 - line 29; figures 4,6,7; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0207337 (LARSEN RONNE PAUL AS [DK]) [A] 1-3 * page 10, line 1 - line 25 * * page 11, line 27 - page 12, line 10; figures 3,6,7 *; | [DY]EP0514583 (PARENTI GIUSEPPE [IT]) [DY] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 48; figure -; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0514583 |