Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0695835 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0695835



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 154
16.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
27.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.02.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.12.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
23.11.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.07.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
22.07.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
30.06.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
11.06.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
11.06.1999 Description Search / examination 4
11.06.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.04.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.03.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
18.03.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.02.1999 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
28.01.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.01.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.12.1998 Claims Search / examination 1
07.12.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
28.10.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.07.1998 Claims Search / examination 1
16.07.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.07.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.10.1996 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
04.09.1996 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
08.02.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.02.1996 European search report Search / examination 3
13.12.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.12.1995 European search report Search / examination 3
13.12.1995 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
10.10.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.10.1995 Claims Search / examination 3
10.10.1995 Description Search / examination 9
10.10.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
10.10.1995 Drawings Search / examination 4
10.10.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
30.11.1993 Priority document Search / examination 17
30.11.1993 Priority document Search / examination 21