blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0695835


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.10.2009 Change - representative published on  25.11.2009  [2009/48]
06.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
19.09.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.11.2003  [2003/45]
22.02.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2002  [2002/15]
08.02.2002 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2002  [2002/13]
30.11.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.01.2002  [2002/03]
11.05.2001 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2001 [2001/26]
23.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
03.03.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.12.1999 Renewal fee
29.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant
29.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
19.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
16.06.1999 Examination report or reply
30.03.1999 Examination report or reply
23.03.1999 Examination report or reply
04.02.1999 Examination report or reply
02.02.1999 Examination report or reply
19.01.1999 Examination report or reply
11.12.1998 Examination report or reply
03.12.1998 Renewal fee
23.10.1998 Examination report or reply
21.07.1998 Examination report or reply
10.07.1998 First examination report
07.07.1998 Examination report or reply
05.12.1997 Renewal fee
06.12.1996 Renewal fee
13.09.1996 Request for examination filed published on  30.10.1996 [1996/44]
09.02.1996 Publication of search report published on  27.03.1996 [1996/13]
08.01.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.02.1996 [1996/06]